+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1539 is now Act 478
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 and #2.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Hendren
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rapert
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 16
March 8, 2017: Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 17
March 6, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor