+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1531 is now Act 698
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor