+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1523 is now Act 566
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Petty
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4