+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1519 is now Act 638
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor