+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Died in the House at Sine Die
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
+ − Vote
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor