+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1509 is now Act 966
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Motion to expunge vote passed
- The vote by which HB1509 Passed was expunged.
- Re-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment Chamber: House H2 Brown 4/15/2021 6:58:59 PM PDF
Sponsored by Brown
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Brown
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
April 19, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
April 14, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor