+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1470 is now Act 1340
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hutchinson
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Williams
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Williams
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9