+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1467 is now Act 443
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Woods
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor