+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by E. Armstrong
Amendment H2
Sponsored by E. Armstrong
Amendment H1
Sponsored by E. Armstrong
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor