+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1455 is now Act 356
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor