+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1446 is now Act 520
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Williams
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
March 10, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 13