+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1446 is now Act 655
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor