+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1446 is now Act 471
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Fite
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Fite
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor