+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1443 is now Act 830
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hickey
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Vaught
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7