+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1438 is now Act 416
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Shepherd
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13