+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1435 is now Act 952
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Rules suspended.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Pilkington
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 22