+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1428 is now Act 383
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor