+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1427 is now Act 318
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Della Rosa
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Della Rosa
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor