+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1426 is now Act 316
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Della Rosa
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor