+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1425 is now Act 566
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transfer to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 3, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor