+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1425 is now Act 366
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor