+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1420 is now Act 597
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Boyd
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Boyd
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16