+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1419 is now Act 430
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lowery
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor