+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rep. Gossage served notice that he will, within the time prescribed, move to reconsider the vote by which HB1412 failed to pass.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Clincher motion failed
- Read the third time and failed.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 10
February 25, 2013: Clincher motion failed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 55
- Present/NV: 20