+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1409 is now Act 505
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Receded from Amendment No. 2
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Woods
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Woods
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
March 14, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor