+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1407 is now Act 369
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3