+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Notification that HB1407 is now Act 441
On March 31, 2023 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 & 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 & 2
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Sponsors (64)
M. McKee
Type:
Primary Sponsor