+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1405 is now Act 734
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 4 read and concurred in.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 4
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 4
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4, RECEDING from Amendment #3.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by J. Hendren
Amendment S3
Sponsored by J. Hendren
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Hendren
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hendren
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2017: Senate amendment # 4 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 20
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 15, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor