+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1404 is now Act 324
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor