+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1401 is now Act 1114
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 11
March 29, 2011: Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 9