+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1399 is now Act 686
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Received from the House.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 27, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor