+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Webb
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Webb
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor