+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1393 is now Act 547
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Della Rosa
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2019: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor