+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1392 is now Act 287
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor