+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1384 is now Act 1336
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in.
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 3.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 3.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended #3 having expunged the vote on amendment #2
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Irvin
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Irvin
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Miller
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
April 16, 2013: Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
April 9, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor