+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1382 is now Act 1021
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Gazaway
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Gazaway
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Gazaway
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor