+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1380 is now Act 533
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1`
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Received from the House.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Cheatham
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2015: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 23, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor