+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as requested.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as requested.
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Bell
+ − Vote
March 20, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor