+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1376 is now Act 212
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor