+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1373 is now Act 505
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Collins
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5