+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1370 is now Act 271
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor