+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1368 is now Act 437
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Baltz
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor