+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1366 is now Act 344
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Pierce
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2015: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14
March 2, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor