+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1365 is now Act 253
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
February 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9