+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Underwood
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Underwood
+ − Vote
March 11, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5