+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1358 is now Act 316
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
March 4, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor