+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Clincher motion failed of adoption
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Murdock
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Murdock
+ − Vote
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor