+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Sounding of the Ballot requested on the passage HB1349.
- Upon Sounding of the Ballot, HB1349 failed to pass.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Roll call requested. Motion passed.
- The vote by which HB1349 Failed to Pass was expunged.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Sounding of the Ballot requsted on the passage of HB1349.
- Upon Sounding of the Ballot, HB1349 failed to pass.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Motion passed.
- The vote by which HB1349 Failed to Pass was expunged.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time.
- Motion to Lay on the Table failed.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Motion passed.
- Read the third time and failed.
- The vote by which HB 1349 failed to pass was expunged.
- Motion for CLINCHER Failed.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Warren
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2021: HB 1349 failed to pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor