+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1329 is now Act 183
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor