+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1327 is now Act 766
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Bryant
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Bryant
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
April 7, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 16